THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 1:51:37 AM
Willans, Martin John
CPSO#:
21099
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Nov 1967
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd.
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, Ontario
M9L 0A3
Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Fax: (647) 933-2904
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 21 Oct 2011
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:28 Nov 1967 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 1967 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 11 May 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Aug 2011 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: August 3, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Martin John Willans has resigned from the College.