skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 31/07/21 6:14:45 AM

Persyko, Lucien

CPSO#: 21047

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jul 2021
EXPIRY DATE
09 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 1967

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: DOCUdavit Solutions Phone# 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 08 Jan 2021


Instructions: Docudavit Solutions 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 06 Jan 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 2021