skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 08/08/22 0:39:02 AM

Deep, Albert Ross

CPSO#: 20977

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 30 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Aug 1967

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: Queen's University, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:26 Nov 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1967
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 21 Dec 2006
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 30 Jul 2008

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Dec 2010
Summary:

On December 14, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Albert Ross Deep committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that having regard to all the circumstances would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

While his certificate of registration was suspended, Dr. Deep engaged in the practice of medicine in accepting a referral from another physician, ordering diagnostic blood tests, diagnosing disease and prescribing medications that could be dispensed only on the order of a physician. Dr. Deep was fully aware that his certificate of registration had been suspended. Dr. Deep's actions constituted a deliberate flouting of the College's authority.

On May 24, 2011, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that Dr. Deep pay to the College costs in the amount of $10,950, to be paid within 30 days of the date of this order. The Committee found that Dr. Deep has demonstrated complete ungovernability and that, if Dr. Deep's certificate of registration had not already been revoked, revocation would have been the appropriate penalty in this case.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Dec 14, 2010

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 29 Apr 2008
Summary:

On April 29, 2008, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Deep to have committed acts of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and that he is incompetent.

On July 30, 2008, the Discipline Committee orders and directs that:

1. The Registrar revoke the certificate of registration of Dr. Albert Ross Deep effective immediately.

2. Dr. Deep pay to the College costs in the amount of $47,500, to be paid within 30 days of the date of this Order, unless the Committee has made an order following submissions that varies the date or terms of payment.

On May 17, 2008, Dr. Deep appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Divisional Court. Pursuant to ss.37 and 71 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, the decision of the Committee remained in effect despite the appeal. On December 2, 2009, the Divisional Court dismissed the appeal, Dr. Deep not having posted security for costs as per the Order of Karakatsanis J. of November 17, 2009.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 2009-12-02
Hearing Date(s): Apr 29, 2008