THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 7:19:38 AM
Hachinski, Vladimir
CPSO#:
20916
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jun 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of Toronto, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
339-291 Windermere Rd
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
Room B7-003
London ON N6G 2J9
Electoral District: 02
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto, ON M4N 3M5
OR
University Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London, ON N6A 5A5
Date Received: 21 May 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:01 Jan 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VLADIMIR HACHINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HACHINSKI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1967 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 2021 |