skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 14/07/20 5:19:59 AM

Marshall, Lynn Margaret

CPSO#: 20901

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Dec 1969
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Environmental Health Clinic
77 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Phone: (416) 351-3764
Fax: (416) 323-6130 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LYNN MARGARET MARSHALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSHALL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Mar 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1969