THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/09/23 3:55:43 AM
Rathbun, James Broatch
CPSO#:
20853
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 1967
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 1967
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
C07 - 3000 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 2V1
Phone: (416) 267-2334
Fax: (416) 267-2539
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough General Hospital |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:06 Mar 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES BROATCH RATHBUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RATHBUN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1967 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: June 24, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: October 11, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Please note that the portion of the Public Summary requiring Dr. Rathbun to attend at the College to be cautioned in person with respect to his record keeping has been returned to the ICRC for removal, as directed by the Health Profession Appeal and Review Board.
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)