THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:55:19 AM
Gosse, Gordon David
CPSO#:
20849
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Dec 1975
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Dec 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-71 Mearns Crt
Bowmanville ON L1C 4N4
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:02 Dec 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GORDON DAVID GOSSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOSSE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1967 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Jun 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 1975 |