THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 1:04:56 AM
Emmett, John Albert Jephson
CPSO#:
20800
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
14 Oct 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Jun 1967
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German, Italian
Education: University of Queensland Faculty of Medi, 1954
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:13 Nov 1967 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1967 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 14 Oct 2002 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 07 Oct 2002
Summary:
On October 7, 2002, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Emmett(s plea of guilty and found him guilty of professional misconduct in that he sexually abused a patient. The Committee ordered the following penalty:
1. The Discipline Committee requires Dr. Emmett to attend before this panel to be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.
2. The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to revoke Dr. Emmett(s certificate of registration effective October 14, 2002.
3. The Discipline Committee Orders Dr. Emmett to reimburse the College for funding up to the amount of $10,000 provided for the complainant under the program required under s. 85.7 of the Health Professions Procedural Code and directs Dr. Emmett to post security in the amount of $10,000 acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario to guarantee the payment of any amounts Dr. Emmett may be required to reimburse under this order.
In addition, the Discipline Committee requires that Dr. Emmett pay part of the College(s costs to the College, fixed in the amount of $ 2,500.00 by October 28, 2002.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 07, 2002