THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:52:42 AM
Daniels, Nelson John
CPSO#:
20764
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
28 Jan 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 May 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:The Burnview Clinic
Suite 100
3225 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON M1H 3C2
Date Received: 17 Feb 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1967 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 May 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 28 May 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Jan 2017 |
Concerns
Source:
QA Committee
Active Date: January 28, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Nelson J. Daniels to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 28, 2017:
Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Daniels’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result, Dr. Daniels has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)