THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 19:49:38 PM
Fowler, Peter John
CPSO#:
20745
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
13 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:18 Nov 1969 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1967 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 12 Feb 1969 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Apr 1969 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1969 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 May 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Jun 2013 |