THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 15:37:10 PM
Sommers, Izzy
CPSO#:
20697
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Apr 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
1-Apr-2016
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 1961 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Jul 1962 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 1967 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 29 Nov 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Apr 1992 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2003 |