skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 29/06/22 6:22:46 AM

Hebb, Alan Ralph

CPSO#: 20588

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Dec 1966

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Maple Villa Long Term Care Centre, 441 Maple Avenue, Burlington, ON L7S 1L8
Date Received: 04 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015