THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 13:25:15 PM
Schmalfuss, Peter Ernst Hans
CPSO#:
20570
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
16 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German, Italian
Education: University of Toronto, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd.
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place,
Toronto, ON
M9L 0A3
Tel: (800) 775-0093
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 25 Aug 2011
Instructions/Address:Patients can leave a voicemail message at (416) 256-7850 and Dr. Schmalfuss's assistant will make the appropriate arrangements.
Date Received: 16 Aug 2011
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 1966 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee |
Effective: 24 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Jun 2014 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: May 30, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Schmalfuss has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario of any other jurisdiction.