THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 9:33:02 AM
Bhushan, Chhabi
CPSO#:
20517
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
15 Dec 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Lucknow, 1957
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1959 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jul 1960 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1961 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jul 1962 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1962 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1963 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 1966 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Oct 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 1974 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 15 Dec 1986 |