THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 3:57:22 AM
Casserly, James Gordon
CPSO#:
20461
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Dec 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Jul 1966
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 30 Aug 2011
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 Jan 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:01 Jan 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1965 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 1966 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2010 |
Concerns
Source:
Discipline Committee
Active Date: January 31, 2010
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective December 31, 2010, Dr. Casserly has resigned from the College and has agreed never to practise again in Ontario or any other jurisdiction and has done so during investigations and a disciplinary proceeding.