THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 3:04:42 AM
Dacosta, Granville Arman
CPSO#:
20447
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jul 1966
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jul 1966
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
567 Christie Street
Toronto ON M6G 3E4
Phone: (647) 343-1234
Fax: (416) 651-9192
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Jamaica
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:28 Nov 1966 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GRANVILLE ARMAN DACOSTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DACOSTA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1964 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1966 |