THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:32:12 AM
Sweeney, Denis Brendan
CPSO#:
20401
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Jul 1966
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
23-May-2017
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1956
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Sweeney's records are being stored by Dr. N Rajanit and Dr. K Cobean at the following location:
Suite 201
6 Maginn Mews
Don Mills, ON
M3C 0G9
Tel: (416) 447-4611
Date Received: 10 May 2011
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:29 Nov 1961 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1966 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2011 |