THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 15:33:29 PM
Pinilla, Jose Vicente
CPSO#:
19964
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 1966
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
2-Aug-2021
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish
Education: National University of Colombia, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd.
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, Ontario
M9L 0A3
Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Fax: (647) 933-2904
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 27 Jun 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1963 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1966 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2012 |