skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 29/06/22 21:48:55 PM

Hoffman, David Verne

CPSO#: 19938

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 Jun 1966

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David Hoffman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 10 2018
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Medical records location as per above.
Port Arthur Health Centre
194 Court St N
Thunder Bay, ON  P7A 4V7
Tel:  807-346-1000
Date Received: 02 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:06 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2018