THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 15:41:13 PM
Handysides, Allan Robert
CPSO#:
19896
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
18 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Jun 1966
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Edinburgh, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Suite 201
2115 Finch Avenue West
North York, ON M3N 2V6
Date Received: 18 Jun 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:18 Nov 1969 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:05 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 1964 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 1965 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1966 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Jun 2014 |