THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:54:18 AM
Macleod, Eric Campbell
CPSO#:
19808
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jan 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Feb 1966
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
30-Apr-2020
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Aberdeen School of Medicin, 1954
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:126 Hyland Drive
Sudbury, ON P3E 1R6
Date Received: 07 Dec 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jan 1965 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 1964 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 1966 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2016 |