THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 6:43:57 AM
Bier, Norman Blackwell
CPSO#:
19748
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
25 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Jun 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1963 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Jun 1964 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Dec 1965 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Apr 1968 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Jun 2008 |