skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 12/04/21 18:29:54 PM

Spudas, Alexander Jonas

CPSO#: 19746

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jan 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Lithuanian

Education:Johannes Gutenberg University at Mainz, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene St, North York, ON M6B 3Z4 Tel: 1-(888) 781-9083
Date Received: 28 Jun 2020


Address: DocuDavit Solutions 1-(888) 781-9083
Date Received: 28 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1965
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2020
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 3, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Spudas to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 3, 2020:

Dr. Spudas has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in any jurisdiction and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.