THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 2:23:46 AM
Mackenzie, Robert Arthur
CPSO#:
19725
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Nuclear Medicine Department
London Health Sciences Centre
Phone: 519-685-8500
St Joseph's Health Care London
PO Box 5777, Stn B
London, ON N6A 4V2
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock, ON N4V 0A4
Phone: 519-421-4211
Date Received: 01 Jun 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nuclear Medicine |
Effective:21 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 1965 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 01 May 1967 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 May 1970 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 02 Aug 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |