THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 9:09:43 AM
Kumar, Ganraj
CPSO#:
19675
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Aug 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Aug 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
45-2645 Lawrence Ave E
Mapel Walk in Clinic
Scarborough ON M1P 2S2
Phone: 647 261 2273
Fax: 647 793 8384
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Ganraj Kumar, Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 15 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Nov 1966 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GANRAJ KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMAR is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 1965 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 25 Mar 1969 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 1984 |