THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
14/05/24 23:31:37 PM
Debow, Stanley Lawrence
CPSO#:
19673
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
20 Dec 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Aug 1965
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Stanley Debow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 1 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:914 Dupont Street, Toronto, Ontario M6H 1Z2
Date Received: 20 Dec 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jan 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1964 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 1965 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Dec 2018 |