skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/06/22 4:36:46 AM

Dicum, Francis Joseph Wilfred Doraraj

CPSO#: 19659

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jul 1965

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. F. Dicum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 9 2015
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, Ontario  M3J 1Y6
Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com

Or:

Upper Canada Lower Bowel Clinic
Suite 301
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto, ON  M4T 3A7
Date Received: 07 Apr 2005

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:13 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015