THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:41:26 PM
Yabsley, Reginald Herbert
CPSO#:
19650
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Jul 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:04 Dec 1965 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 1960 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 1965 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Jan 1967 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2002 |