THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 8:04:33 AM
Brown, Isabella Patricia
CPSO#:
19611
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
13 Sep 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
13-Sep-2000
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1946
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 1963 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Oct 1963 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Apr 1964 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1965 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1993 |