THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:36:41 PM
Zeilig, Lauren Vincent
CPSO#:
19593
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Nov 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Sep 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. L.V. Zeilig Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 24 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:All medical records stored DOCUdavit Solutions inc. Address: 28 Eugene Street, Toronto, ON, M6B 3Z4. Tel: 416-781-9083
Date Received: 19 Feb 2020
Instructions/Address:All medical records stored DOCUdavit Solutions inc. Address: 26 Eugene Street, Toronto, ON, M6B 3Z4. Tel: 416-881-9083
Date Received: 09 Dec 2019
Instructions/Address:DOCUdavit Solutions Inc.
28 Eugene St
North York, ON M6B 3Z4
Date Received: 02 Dec 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1962 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1965 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 03 May 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 23 May 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: November 30, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Zeilig has resigned from the College effective November 30, 2019.