THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
14/05/24 23:20:42 PM
Harpur, George David
CPSO#:
19499
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jun 1965
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jan 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 220
7275 Hwy # 6
Tobermory ON N0H 2R0
Phone: (519) 596-2305
Fax: (519) 596-2979
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site |
Lions Head |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site |
Markdale |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site |
Meaford |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site |
Wiarton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1981 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GEORGE DAVID HARPUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARPUR is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1964 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1965 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 2020 |