THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:22:52 PM
Ponesse, David John Anthony
CPSO#:
19494
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Mar 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Mar 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1309 Yonge Street
Box 968
Walkerton ON N0G 2V0
Phone: (519) 881-1200
Fax: (519) 881-1201
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: David Ponesse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site |
Walkerton |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: October 7, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On October 7, 2021, South Bruce Grey Health Centre notified the College, pursuant to section 33 of the Public Hospitals Act, that South Bruce Grey Health Centre has suspended the privileges of Dr. David John Anthony Ponesse due to failure to comply with hospital policy. On July 18, 2022, South Bruce Grey Health Centre advised the College that it reinstated Dr. Ponesse’s hospital privileges.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN ANTHONY PONESSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PONESSE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1964 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1965 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Jan 1968 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Mar 1983 |