THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 3:30:50 AM
Hood, Eric
CPSO#:
19489
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Mar 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Jun 1965
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:1507 - 61 St. Clair Avenue W.
Toronto, ON M4V 2Y8
Date Received: 21 Feb 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jan 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1964 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1965 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Mar 2019 |