skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 27/06/22 23:55:32 PM

Vereshack, Paul

CPSO#: 19251

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jul 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jul 1994

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 25 Oct 1991
Summary:

In October 1991, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Vereshack guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Vereshack's licence to practice be revoked.

Appeal: Decision Altered
Appeal Decision Date: 1992-10-09
Hearing Date(s): 21 Oct 1991