THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 13:13:07 PM
Sheriton, Jack Edmund
CPSO#:
19226
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Jul 1964
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 1956
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
9 Tullamor Drive
Willowdale, ON M2L 2E9
Date Received: 05 May 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:10 Nov 1964 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Nov 1963 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1964 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2014 |