skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 12/04/21 19:15:21 PM

Mekdeci, Anthony Casimiro

CPSO#: 19212

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Jul 1964

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 26-Jun-2016

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Medical Solutions 28 Eugene Street North York, ON M6B 3Z4 Phone: 1-888-7819083
Date Received: 24 Oct 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 2013