THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 10:38:47 AM
Bell, David Arthur
CPSO#:
19200
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Jul 1964
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to access a copy of their medical record should send a written request to:
1592 Gloucester Road
London, ON
N6G 2S6
Date Received: 24 May 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:19 Nov 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1963 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1964 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2013 |