THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 4:01:24 AM
Roos, Jaan Olav
CPSO#:
19130
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 Feb 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 May 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Estonian, Swedish
Education: University of Toronto, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:73 Cannon Road
Toronto ON M8Y 1S2
Date Received: 27 Feb 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Respirology |
Effective:25 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1963 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1964 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 26 Apr 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 May 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Feb 2017 |