THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 14:10:32 PM
Millar, Kenneth George
CPSO#:
19051
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Sep 1966
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of St. Andrews, 1959
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:16 Nov 1967 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 1963 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 May 1964 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 03 May 1965 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Sep 1966 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2004 |