THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 13:22:18 PM
Mouldey, Robert Gordon
CPSO#:
18998
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Jan 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Dec 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1958
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:29 Nov 1966 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Mar 1964 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2018 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: December 13, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Gordon Mouldey to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 13, 2017:
Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Mouldey’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result, Dr. Mouldey has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.