THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 22:17:43 PM
Murray, Malcolm Erwin
CPSO#:
18987
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
18 Nov 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Feb 1964
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1956
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: February 14, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On February 22, 2011, Joseph Brant Hospital notified the College that Dr. Malcolm Erwin Murray’s privileges were revoked, effective February 14, 2011.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:10 Nov 1964 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 1964 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Nov 2011 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: November 18, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective November 18, 2011, Dr. Murray has resigned from the College and has agreed not to apply or reapply for registration as a physician or for a license to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.