THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 10:37:32 AM
Brezina, Jeanie Shkimba
CPSO#:
18854
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
09 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 May 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Polish, Russian, Ukrainian
Education: University of Toronto, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1962 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Jul 1963 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 1963 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Fitness to Practise Committee |
Effective: 14 Feb 1998 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 22 May 1999 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 May 1999 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 22 May 1999 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 09 Jan 2002 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2012 |