THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 0:05:47 AM
Wallace, Charles James
CPSO#:
18844
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Mar 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1955
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Limited
Head Office
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Toll Free: 1-800-775-0093
www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 09 Jul 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 1962 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 1963 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: June 30, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Charles J Wallace to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Membership Services Department):
I, Dr. Charles J Wallace:
(2) Acknowledge that I was the subject of an investigation by the College regarding whether I have maintained the standard of practice of the profession (the “Investigation”).
Resignation from Practice
(3) Hereby resign from the College effective June 30, 2014 (the “Effective Date”).
(4) Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.
Resignation of Prescribing Privileges
(9) Undertake and agree that in my practice prior to the Effective Date, I will not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the following substances:
Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);
Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19); or
(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto as Schedule “B”; and the current regulatory lists are attached hereto as Schedule “C”)
Monitored Drugs (as noted in Schedule “D”)
Anti-psychotic medication, anti-depressant medication, anti-anxiety medication, mood stabilizing medication and medication used to promote wakefulness, whether or not they are controlled drugs and substances.
(15) Consent to this Undertaking being entered on the pubic register