THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 10:52:06 AM
Theobald, Geoffrey Mann
CPSO#:
18837
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Oct 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 May 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: English Conjoint Board, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Geoffrey M. Theobald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1961 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1962 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1963 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Dec 1968 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 May 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Oct 2022 |