THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:00:04 AM
Hennen, Brian Kenneth Edward
CPSO#:
18816
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Jul 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1969 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1962 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1963 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2006 |