THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:44:42 PM
Scott, Peter Alan
CPSO#:
18754
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
16 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Mar 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1957
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:13 Nov 1963 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1963 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Mar 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 17 Mar 2004 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Jun 2016 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Jan 1985
Summary:
In January 1985, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Scott guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty:
1. Dr. Scott(s licence was to be suspended for a period of 180 days. This suspension was itself to be suspended, subject to Dr. Scott(s compliance with the following conditions:
(a) Dr. Scott was to submit to an inspection of his practice of the kind contemplated by s. 64 of the Health Disciplines Act, not limited to a single act or occurrence, but to all or that part of his practice which the Registrar considered appropriate, to take place within six months of the date upon which this Order became final.
(b) If the Registrar was not satisfied with the report following the inspection, a further inspection might take place not more than eighteen months following receipt of the report covering the first inspection on the same terms and conditions.
Upon compliance with the above conditions, the suspension of licence was to be revoked. In the event of Dr. Scott(s failure to comply with any of the above conditions, the said suspension of licence was forthwith to come into force.
2. Dr. Scott was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. The Committee also recommended that his name be published. In the event that Dr. Scott failed to appear at the time and place set by the Registrar for his reprimand, his licence to practice was to be suspended until such time as he appeared for his reprimand.
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): 14 Jan 1985