THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:10:01 AM
Prince, Douglas Arthur
CPSO#:
18706
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 May 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Nov 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
11-May-2018
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Douglas Prince Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 27 2012
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:ODS
PO Box 2071
Sudbury, ON
P3A 4R8
Tel: 1-877-560-4637 or 705-560-8461
Fax: 705-524-8012
Email: [email protected]
Website: www.odstorage.com
Date Received: 02 Feb 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1963 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 May 2012 |