THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 16:58:01 PM
D'Ovidio, Vincenzo
CPSO#:
18549
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
13 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Dec 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Bologna, 1957
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St Regis Crescent South
Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Tel: 416 398 0638
Fax: 416 398 5932
Toll Free: 1 888 563 3732
Date Received: 08 Jul 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Oct 1960 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Nov 1962 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2014 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 13 Aug 2015 |