THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:28:31 AM
Vedova, Joseph Dalla
CPSO#:
18533
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Oct 1962
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
30-Jan-2019
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Naples, 1953
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Joseph D. Vedova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 7 2012
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Safe Store
2704 Hwy 20
Fonthill, ON
L0S 1E6
Tel: (905) 892-0010
Date Received: 09 May 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:13 Nov 1962 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 1959 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 1962 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2012 |