THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:39:06 AM
Keresteci, Ara Kapriel
CPSO#:
18532
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
11 Aug 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Aug 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
14-Nov-2011
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Armenian, English, Turkish
Education: Istanbul University, 1954
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:30 Nov 1962 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1957 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1961 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Oct 1962 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Aug 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2004 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2006 |